- Details
- Written by: Administrator
- Category: MEMBERS OF THIRTEEN LEGISLATURE
- Hits: 196
Hon. Jay Ngwele
RDP
Contact Address:Parliament of Vanuatu
PMB 9052
Port Vila
Vanuatu
Phone: +67833060 / +67822229
Basic Information
Constituency: Ambae
Parliamentary Appointment:
Re-elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Ambae Constituency in 2020
Elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Ambae Constituency in 2016
Re-elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Ambae Constituency in 2020
Elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Ambae Constituency in 2016
Parliamentary Committee:
Ministerial Appointments:
Minister of Infrastructure and Public Utilities, Appointed on 20 April 2020
Ministerial Appointments:
Minister of Infrastructure and Public Utilities, Appointed on 20 April 2020
Education:
Central Primary School
Malapoa College
UNITECH - NZAID
Occupation before entering Parliament:
Chairmen of NISCOL
Year of birth: 05/ 04 / 1973
Central Primary School
Malapoa College
UNITECH - NZAID
Occupation before entering Parliament:
Chairmen of NISCOL
Year of birth: 05/ 04 / 1973
Home island: Ambae
- Details
- Written by: Administrator
- Category: MEMBERS OF THIRTEEN LEGISLATURE
- Hits: 162
Hon. Ian Wilson Toakalana
Vanuatu Leaders Party
Contact Address:Parliament of Vanuatu
PMB 9052
Port Vila
Vanuatu
Phone: +67833060 / +67822229
Basic Information
Constituency: Maewo
Parliamentary Appointment:
Elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Maewo Constituency in 2016
Elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Maewo Constituency in 2016
Parliamentary Committee:
Chairman of Committee on Privileges, Entitlements and Parliamentary Rights, 3 May 2016
Chairman of Committee on Privileges, Entitlements and Parliamentary Rights, 3 May 2016
Ministerial Appointments:
Education:
Year 13
Occupation before entering Parliament:
Self Employed
Year of birth: 8 / 09 /1965
Education:
Year 13
Occupation before entering Parliament:
Self Employed
Year of birth: 8 / 09 /1965
Home island: Maewo
- Details
- Written by: Administrator
- Category: MEMBERS OF THIRTEEN LEGISLATURE
- Hits: 164
Hon. Esmon Saimon
Vanuaaku Pati (VP)
Contact Address:Parliament of Vanuatu
PMB 9052
Port Vila
Vanuatu
Phone: +67833060
Basic Information
Constituency: Malekula
Parliamentary Appointment:
Re -elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Malekula Constituency in 2020
Re -elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Malekula Constituency in 2016
Re -elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Malekula Constituency in 2012
Re -elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Malekula Constituency in 2008
Re -elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Malekula Constituency in 2004
Re -elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Malekula Constituency in 2002
Elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Malekula Constituency in 1998
Re -elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Malekula Constituency in 2020
Re -elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Malekula Constituency in 2016
Re -elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Malekula Constituency in 2012
Re -elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Malekula Constituency in 2008
Re -elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Malekula Constituency in 2004
Re -elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Malekula Constituency in 2002
Elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Malekula Constituency in 1998
Parliamentary Committee Appointments:
Member of Committee on standing Orders Review, 3 May 2014
Member of Committee on standing Orders Review, 3 May 2014
Ministerial Appointments:
Minister of Justice and Social Welfare, Appointed on 20 April 2020
Speaker of Parliament, Elected on 11 February 2016 to 6 September 2019
Minister of infrastructure and Public Works, Appointed on 23 March 2013
Second Deputy Speaker of Parliament, Elected on 29 July 2004
Minister of Ni- Vanutau Business, Appointed on 18 February 2011 - 17 May 2011
Minister of NI-Vanuatu Business and Cooperatives, Appointed on 22 September 2008
Minister of Justice and Social Welfare, Appointed on 20 April 2020
Speaker of Parliament, Elected on 11 February 2016 to 6 September 2019
Minister of infrastructure and Public Works, Appointed on 23 March 2013
Second Deputy Speaker of Parliament, Elected on 29 July 2004
Minister of Ni- Vanutau Business, Appointed on 18 February 2011 - 17 May 2011
Minister of NI-Vanuatu Business and Cooperatives, Appointed on 22 September 2008
Education:
South West Bay Primary school, Malekula, 1964 - 1969
Laindua Primary School, South West Bay, Malekula, 1970 - 1974
South West Bay Primary school, Malekula, 1964 - 1969
Laindua Primary School, South West Bay, Malekula, 1970 - 1974
Occupation before entering Parliament:
Secretary to South West Bay Cooperative Society, 1978 - 1982
Private Business entrepreneur (Retail and Fishing), 1983 - 1998
Member for Malampa Province, 1992 - 1996
Secretary to South West Bay Cooperative Society, 1978 - 1982
Private Business entrepreneur (Retail and Fishing), 1983 - 1998
Member for Malampa Province, 1992 - 1996
Year of birth: 28 October 1955
Home island:Malekula
- Details
- Written by: Administrator
- Category: MEMBERS OF THIRTEEN LEGISLATURE
- Hits: 688
GJP
Contact Address:Parliament of Vanuatu
PMB 9052
Port Vila
Vanuatu
Phone: +67833060 / +67822229
Basic Information
Constituency: Ambrym
Parliamentary Appointment:
Elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Ambrym Constituency in 2020
Elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Ambrym Constituency in 2020
Parliamentary Committee:
Ministerial Appointments:
None
Ministerial Appointments:
None
Education:
MBA Charles Stuart University
BA Economies, Trent University
Honours BA policy Studies, Trent University
Occupation before entering Parliament:
Micro Business owner
NGO Policy Analyst
Economist
Consultant
Year of birth: 12 October1966
MBA Charles Stuart University
BA Economies, Trent University
Honours BA policy Studies, Trent University
Occupation before entering Parliament:
Micro Business owner
NGO Policy Analyst
Economist
Consultant
Year of birth: 12 October1966
Home island: Ambrym
- Details
- Written by: Administrator
- Category: MEMBERS OF THIRTEEN LEGISLATURE
- Hits: 961
Hon. Charlot Salwai
Union of Moderate Party (2002 - 2012)
RMC
Parliament of Vanuatu
PMB 9052
Port Vila
Vanuatu
Phone: +67833060 /+67822229
Basic Information
Constituency: Pentecost
Parliamentary Appointment:
Re-elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Pentecost Constituency in 2020
Re-elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Pentecost Constituency in 2016
Re-elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Pentecost Constituency in 2012
Re-elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Pentecost Constituency in 2008
Re-elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Pentecost Constituency in 2004
Elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Pentecost Constituency in 2002
Re-elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Pentecost Constituency in 2020
Re-elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Pentecost Constituency in 2016
Re-elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Pentecost Constituency in 2012
Re-elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Pentecost Constituency in 2008
Re-elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Pentecost Constituency in 2004
Elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Pentecost Constituency in 2002
Parliamentary Committee:
Chairman of Public Accounts Committee
Opposition Whip, 2005 - 2007
Chairman of Public Accounts Committee
Opposition Whip, 2005 - 2007
Ministerial Appointments:
Deputy Leader of Opposition, Elected on 22 April 2020
Prime Minister, Elected on 11 February 2016 to 20 April 2020
Minister of Internal Affairs, Appointed on 15 May 2014 - 11 June 2015
Leader of Opposition Whip, Appointed on 23 March 2013 to 15 May 2014
Minister for Finance and Economic Management, Appointed on the 19th November 2012
Minister for Education, Appointed on the 20th December 2010
Minister for Education, Appointed on the 30th September 2008.
Minister for Lands and Natural Resources, Appointed on the 19th August 2004.
Deputy Leader of Opposition, 2004 - 2005
Minister of Trades and Industries, Appointed on the 29th July 2004.
Deputy Leader of Opposition, Elected on 22 April 2020
Prime Minister, Elected on 11 February 2016 to 20 April 2020
Minister of Internal Affairs, Appointed on 15 May 2014 - 11 June 2015
Leader of Opposition Whip, Appointed on 23 March 2013 to 15 May 2014
Minister for Finance and Economic Management, Appointed on the 19th November 2012
Minister for Education, Appointed on the 20th December 2010
Minister for Education, Appointed on the 30th September 2008.
Minister for Lands and Natural Resources, Appointed on the 19th August 2004.
Deputy Leader of Opposition, 2004 - 2005
Minister of Trades and Industries, Appointed on the 29th July 2004.
Education:
1985-1986 Lycee Blaise Pascal, (Bachelor G2), New Caledonia
1983-1984 Bourail Technical College, (Technical Education Certificate), New Caledonia
1983 Bourail College, (General Education Certificate), New Caledonia
1983-1984 Bourail Technical College, (Technical Education Certificate), New Caledonia
1985-1986 Lycee Blaise Pascal, (Bachelor G2), New Caledonia.
1985-1986 Lycee Blaise Pascal, (Bachelor G2), New Caledonia
1983-1984 Bourail Technical College, (Technical Education Certificate), New Caledonia
1983 Bourail College, (General Education Certificate), New Caledonia
1983-1984 Bourail Technical College, (Technical Education Certificate), New Caledonia
1985-1986 Lycee Blaise Pascal, (Bachelor G2), New Caledonia.
Occupation before entering Parliament:
Accounts, Unelco, 1987 - 1988
Accountant, Development Bank, 1988 - 1990
Accountant, MSP Ltd, 1990 - 1991
Private Secretary, Prime Minister Carlot Korman, 1991 - 1995
Second Secretary, Ministry of Finance, 1996
First Secretary, Ministry of Education, 1997 - 1998
First Political Advisor, Ministry of Trade, 1998 - 1999
First Political Advisor, Ministry of Youth and Sport, 2000 - 2002
Accounts, Unelco, 1987 - 1988
Accountant, Development Bank, 1988 - 1990
Accountant, MSP Ltd, 1990 - 1991
Private Secretary, Prime Minister Carlot Korman, 1991 - 1995
Second Secretary, Ministry of Finance, 1996
First Secretary, Ministry of Education, 1997 - 1998
First Political Advisor, Ministry of Trade, 1998 - 1999
First Political Advisor, Ministry of Youth and Sport, 2000 - 2002
Year of birth: 24 April 1963
Home island: Pentecost