- Details
- Written by: Administrator
- Category: MEMBERS OF THIRTEEN LEGISLATURE
- Hits: 626
Hon. TOMKER NETVUNEI
Leaders Party Vanuatu
Contact Address:
Parliament of Vanuatu
C/o Parliament House
P. O. Box: 6209, Port Vila
Vanuatu
Phone: +67833060 / +67822229
Basic Information
Constituency: Tafea Outer Islands
Parliamentary Appointment:
None
Parliamentary Committee:
None
Ministerial Appointments:
MINISTER OF YOUTH AND SPORTS
Education:
1991 to 1994-Epi High School
1996 to 1997-2 Years USP Emalus, Port Vila
2003-Project Management
Political carreer : 2016 to 2020-Elected to Parliament
2022 to 2026-Re-Elected to Parliament
Occupation before entering Parliament:
1990 to 2000Far North Timber Sales and Marketing Manager
2004 to 2008 South Pacific Sandalwood Ltd
Year of birth: 23th October 1977
Home island:
- Details
- Written by: Administrator
- Category: MEMBERS OF THIRTEEN LEGISLATURE
- Hits: 413
Hon. Hymak ANATOLE
UMP
Contact Address:
C/o Parliament House
P. O. Box: 26
Port Vila, Republic of Vanuatu
Mobile: + 678 7767000
Basic Information
Constituency: Malekula
Parliamentary Appointment: 2022 to 2026
Leader of Government Business 2022
Parliamentary Committee: 2022 to 2026
Chairman Economic and Foreign Policy
Member Public Accounts Committee during years 2022
Member AdHoc Committee during years 2021
Ministerial Appointments: 2022 to 2026
Minister Trade, Commerce and Ni-Vanuatu Business
Minister Education and Training Development
POLITICAL CARREER
12th Legislature
2020 to 2022 Elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Efate Constituency
13th Legislature Re -elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Malekula Constituency
Education:
1981 - BAC G1 BACCALAURÉAT G1, Lycée Louis Antoine de Bougainville, Port Vila
1985 - DEUG in Law at the Institute D’Etude Juridique et Economiques of Law Bayonnes, France
1987 - Licence en droit Académie de Bordeaux, France
1988 - Maitrise en Droit- Option Droit Privé – Orléans – France
1990 - Diplôme d’Études Superieurs spécialisés en Droit des affaires et Fiscalités - (DESS – Droit des Affaires et Fiscalités. Bordeaux – France.
Occupation before entering Parliament:
1980 to 1981 - SNAB, Accountant
Jan to Aug 1982 - Bank Indochine, Port Vila
May to June 1989 - Chartered Regional Association of Liberal Profession, Bordeaux France
1991 to 1993 - Occupied the Position of the Deputy Clerk at Parliament House
1993 to 1997 - General Manager of NBV, Port Vila
1997 to 2019 - Human Resource Manager, UNELCO VANUATU LTD
VARIOUS BOARD OF DIRECTORS
1992 to 1994 - PSC (Member of Disciplinary Board
1996 to 1998 - Chamber of Commerce
- GRT
2013 to 2020 - Reserve Bank of Vanuatu Board of Directors
Year of birth: 13th November 1962 in Malekula
Home island: Malekula
- Details
- Written by: Administrator
- Category: MEMBERS OF THIRTEEN LEGISLATURE
- Hits: 326
Hon. Claude Christopher Emelee
Vanuatu National Development Party (VNDP)
Contact Address:
Parliament of Vanuatu
PMB 9052
Port Vila
Vanuatu
Phone: +67833060 / +67822229
Basic Information
Constituency: Torres
Parliamentary Appointment:
Re-elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Torres Constituency in 2020
Re-elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Torres Constituency in 2016
Elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Torres Constituency in 2012
Parliamentary Committee:
Member of Committee on Foreign Affairs and External Trade, 3 May 2016
Member of Committee on Members Ethics and Integrity, 3 May 2016
Ministerial Appointments:
Minister of Internal Affairs, Appointed on 18 February 2014 - 26 February 2014
Minister of Justice and community services, Appointed on 26 February 2014
Deputy Prime Minister and Minister of Agriculture, Fisheries, Forestry and Biosecurity, Appointed on 11 November 2015 - 11 February 2015
Minister of Infrastructure and Public Utility, Appointed on 10 November 2018 to 20 April 2020
Education:
Occupation before entering Parliament:
Vanuatu honorary consul to NZ, 1992 - 1996
Managing director tuna fishing, since 1998
Vanuatu fishing fleet administrator, since 2003
Chairman Vanuatu Maritime Authorities, 2003 - 2007
Year of birth: 09/01/1958
Home island: Hiu
- Details
- Written by: Administrator
- Category: MEMBERS OF THIRTEEN LEGISLATURE
- Hits: 84
Hon. Jack Wona
Vanuatu National Development Party (VNDP)
Contact Address:
Parliament of Vanuatu
PMB 9052
Port Vila
Vanuatu
Phone: +67833060 / +67822229
Basic Information
Constituency:
Banks
Parliamentary Appointment:
Elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Banks Constituency in 2016
Parliamentary Committee:
Member of Committee on standing Orders Review, 3 May 2016
Ministerial Appointments:
Education:
Year 10 Leaving Certificate
Occupation before entering Parliament:
Councilor of Torba Province
Year of birth: 16/08/1965
Home island: Vanualava
- Details
- Written by: Administrator
- Category: MEMBERS OF THIRTEEN LEGISLATURE
- Hits: 872
Hon. Ralph Regenvanu
Graon mo Jastis Party
Contact Address:
Parliament of Vanuatu
PMB 9052
Port Vila
Vanuatu
Phone: +67833060 / +67822229
Basic Information
Constituency:
Port Vila
Parliamentary Appointment:
Re -elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Port Vila Constituency in 2020
Re -elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Port Vila Constituency in 2016
Re -elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Port Vila Constituency in 2012
Elected to the Parliament of Vanuatu for Port Vila Constituency 2008
Parliamentary Committee:
None
Ministerial Appointments:
Leader of Opposition, Elected on 22 April 2020
Minister of Foreign Affairs and External Trades, Appointed on 19 December 2017 to 20 April 2020,
Minister of Lands, Geology and Mines, Energy and Water Resources, Appointed on 11 February 2016 to 19 December 2017
Minister of Lands, Geology and Mines, Energy and Water Resources, Appointed on 23 March 2013 - 11 June 2015
Minister of Justice and Community Services, Appointed on 26 June 2011 - 16 January 2012
Minister of Justice and Social Welfare, Appointed on 10 March 2011
Minister of Lands, Geology, Mines and Rural Water Supply, Appointed on 17 February 2011 - 10 March 2011
Minister of Ni Vanuatu Business, Appointed on 2 December 2010 - 18 February 2011
Education:
NTV, 1979 –1986
Montreal University (France), 1986 –1989
Occupation before entering Parliament:
BA (HONS) Development Studies (Major) - Anthropology (Major)
Year of birth: 20 / 09 / 1970
Home island: Malekula (Uripiv Island)